HINDU TEMPLE CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE OF NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance Hindu Religious teachings, Culture and Community functions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 24 April 1973: Standard registration
- HINDU TEMPLE OF NOTTINGHAM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vikash Mahabir | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darshit Ravani | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhagyesh Makwana | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janki Mehta | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajinder Beri | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vikas Sharma | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ambrish Tiwari | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEETA BHAGAT | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
HARI KRISHAN SOHAL | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RITURAJ MOHAN | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAJESH MOHAN SHARMA | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Payal sood | Trustee | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
brij phakey | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
VEENA SHARMA | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAJ K GIRDHAR | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
VIKAS CHAUHAN | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vinod Beri | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER SAIN SOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.51k | £92.07k | £142.77k | £214.92k | £205.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.90k | £41.95k | £206.71k | £154.07k | £125.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 1973 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1989, 8 JULY 1990, 27 FEBRUARY 2000, 18 JUNE 2000, 13 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 11 JUNE 2006 AND 6 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION AND CULTURE AND FOR THIS PURPOSE BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE: A. PROMOTE SPIRITUAL TEACHING AND THE OBSERVANCES THAT SERVE TO PROMOTE AND MANIFEST THE SAID RELIGION B. EDUCATE CHILDREN AND ADULTS INTO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SAID RELIGION C. TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR THE CONDUCT MARRIAGES, FUNERALS AND OTHER SERVICES ACCORDING TO THE RITES OF THE SAID RELIGION (2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE HINDU COMMUNITY INCLUDING THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SAID RELIGION (3) TO RELIEVE AGED MEMBERS OF THE HINDU COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND ITS ENVIRIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HINDU TEMPLE
215 CARLTON ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 2FX
- Phone:
- 01159113384
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window