Governing document HINDU TEMPLE CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE OF NOTTINGHAM

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 APRIL 1973 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 1989, 8 JULY 1990, 27 FEBRUARY 2000, 18 JUNE 2000, 13 NOVEMBER 2005 AND 11 JUNE 2006 AND 6 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION AND CULTURE AND FOR THIS PURPOSE BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE: A. PROMOTE SPIRITUAL TEACHING AND THE OBSERVANCES THAT SERVE TO PROMOTE AND MANIFEST THE SAID RELIGION B. EDUCATE CHILDREN AND ADULTS INTO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SAID RELIGION C. TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP FOR THE CONDUCT MARRIAGES, FUNERALS AND OTHER SERVICES ACCORDING TO THE RITES OF THE SAID RELIGION (2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE HINDU COMMUNITY INCLUDING THE SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS, IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SAID RELIGION (3) TO RELIEVE AGED MEMBERS OF THE HINDU COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM AND ITS ENVIRIONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.