Trustees HINDU TEMPLE CULTURAL AND COMMUNITY CENTRE OF NOTTINGHAM
Charity number: 502392

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vikash Mahabir | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darshit Ravani | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bhagyesh Makwana | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janki Mehta | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajinder Beri | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vikas Sharma | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ambrish Tiwari | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEETA BHAGAT | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
HARI KRISHAN SOHAL | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RITURAJ MOHAN | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
RAJESH MOHAN SHARMA | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Payal sood | Trustee | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
brij phakey | Trustee | 11 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
VEENA SHARMA | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAJ K GIRDHAR | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
VIKAS CHAUHAN | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Vinod Beri | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
NARINDER SAIN SOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.