CHRIST FIRE REVIVAL MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal activity during the year continued to be practicing christian faith, this includes; training the ministers, worship team, youth leadership, women leadership etc. Evangelism; includes musical outreach for the community etc Sunday services: includes, encouraging, motivational teachings, discussion of life issues, parenting, marital, etc Welfare: includes, bereavement, etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 20 December 2011: Standard registration
- CFRM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EVELYN AFIA WIREKO | Trustee | 20 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Rev DANIEL OWUSU | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.76k | £7.86k | £9.70k | £4.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53k | £19.39k | £5.33k | £4.32k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 October 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH [IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS] IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT;
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 HOUSEMAN GARDENS
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 2HX
- Phone:
- 07886526663
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window