HISTORIC LINCOLN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the benefits of the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and historic environment of Historic Lincoln through major redevelopments. Advancing the education and enjoyment of the public in the historic environment and artefacts of Historic Lincoln by the interpretation of historic sites, and public access to Heritage Skills Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Maxwell Battle | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Professor Louise Jane Wilkinson | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
JENNY WORTH | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
James Julius Christopher Birch | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Richard Anthony Dale | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Baroness Sarah Elizabeth Mary Hogg | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Neal Peter Juster | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Robert William Day | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Hilda Kenyon | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Robert Henry Ruddock | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Anthony Strange | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
George William Lockwood | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Nicholas Walters | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Air Vice-Marshal Paul Anthony Robinson | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|||||||
David Christopher Chambers | Trustee | 24 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £534.17k | £0 | £22.00k | £15.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.54k | £550.62k | £319.28k | £8.53k | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.00k | N/A | £12.00k | N/A | £15.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £534.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £202.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £55.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 AUG 2011
Charitable objects
- TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION,PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT OF HISTORIC LINCOLN - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHYSICAL ENVIRONMENT AND ARTEFACTS OF HISTORIC LINCOLN
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 NEWLAND
LINCOLN
LN1 1XG
- Phone:
- 01522522815
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window