THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALEN, OXFORD

Charity number: 1145027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship and provision of sacred space in central Oxford. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity, promotion of Christianity:events and meetings, and literature. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £188,401
Total expenditure: £177,608

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 2011: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY MAGDALEN PCC OXFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oscar Riba-Thompson Trustee 02 March 2025
None on record
Margaret Wiltshire Cooper Ackerly Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Christopher Robert Adams Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Fleur Beauvais Jensen Taylor Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Henry William Jestico Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Dr Robert Anthony Saunders Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Dr Melanie Kirsten Marshall Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Dr Veronica West-Harling Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Nancy-Jane Rucker Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Deborah Eleanor Vorhies Trustee 15 May 2022
ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Ashley James Walters Trustee 27 September 2020
ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Dr Matthew Robert Irvine Schrecker Trustee 27 September 2020
None on record
Gareth Richard Price Jones Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Charl Andries Morrison Engela Trustee 07 April 2019
ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
Gillian Hamnett Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
JOYCE ANN DAY Trustee 13 December 2011
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Purver Trustee 13 December 2011
None on record
Rev Peter John Groves Trustee 11 December 2011
THE COMMUNITY OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN AT WANTAGE
Received: On time
ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
ST MARY MAGDALEN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ST MARY MAGDALEN OXFORD RESTORATION AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
ST MARY MAGDALEN APPRENTICING AND EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ANGLICAN CATHOLIC FUTURE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £143.68k £125.91k £125.91k £141.91k £188.40k
Total expenditure £139.20k £150.88k £150.88k £149.01k £177.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £701

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 December 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 December 2021 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Mary Magdalen Church
Magdalen Street
Oxford
OX1 3AE
Phone:
01865242484