SHRI SITHI VINAYAGAR THEVASTHANAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing a place of worship for the community, holding religious festivities and providing religious and cultural education to youths in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 22 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kasinathar Sabapathipillai Mahenthiran | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kumarasamy Kumarasthasan | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kumarasamy Gengatharan | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Namasivayam Selvarajah | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|||||
MAILVAGANAM VIJAYAKUMAR | Trustee | 06 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALLIPURAM SRIRANJITHAN | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mylvaganam Mohanadas | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £341.27k | £203.95k | £214.75k | £306.36k | £333.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.62k | £183.08k | £140.98k | £244.40k | £275.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 February 2023 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 23 February 2023 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 December 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 27 December 2021 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 NOV 2011 as amended on 12 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
5.1. TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION BY:- 5.1.1. THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A TEMPLE IN HARROW, MIDDLESEX AND /OR AT SUCH OTHER PLACES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FOR THE PURPOSE OF PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP OF SITHI VINAYAGAR AND OTHER HINDU DEITIES AND FOR OTHER RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE PURPOSES; 5.1.2. PROVIDING RELIGIOUS DISCOURSES AND THE CELEBRATION OF HINDU RITES, CEREMONIES AND FESTIVALS. 5.2. PROMOTING AND CARRYING OUT CHARITABLE WORK IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD 5.3. TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN: 5.3.1. THE HINDU RELIGION AND COMPARATIVE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY 5.3.2. THE HINDU TRADITIONS, HISTORY, LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, CULTURE AND MUSIC 5.4. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENCOURAGE YOUTH ACTIVITIES BY THE ORGANISATION OF YOUTH CAMPS, SPORTS EVENTS, YOUTH SEMINARS AND ASSOCIATED TRAINING AND COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES WITH A VIEW TO PROMOTING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HINDU RELIGION BY ENCOURAGING YOUNGER MEMBERS OF THE HINDU RELIGION, AND THE CHILDREN OF MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY TO PARTICIPATE IN SUCH ACTIVITIES AND ALSO ENCOURAGE AN UNDERSTANDING OF THE HINDU RELIGION AND HINDU CULTURAL ACTIVITIES BY INVITING MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE NOT MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY TO BECOME INVOLVED IN SUCH ACTIVITIES. 5.5. TO PROMOTE INTERFAITH ACTIVITIES, RELIGIOUS TOLERANCE, UNDERSTANDING AND HARMONY BETWEEN DIFFERENT COMMUNITIES AND RELIGIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2D
Nibthwaite Road
Harrow
- Phone:
- 02084275428
- Website:
-
harrowsithivinayagar.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window