THRIVE YOUTH MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has six main aims: - to build on existing, good youth work - to help churches reach more young people - to train and equip leaders to be effective - to mentor youth ministers and leaders - to run a website for all youth ministry needs - to see more young people come to faith in Jesus
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kevin David Johnson | Chair | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Samantha Lee | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Derbyshire | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Selley | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Solt | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Davis | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHNSTON ARCHER | Trustee | 08 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.39k | £97.44k | £135.94k | £204.39k | £225.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.49k | £104.39k | £112.57k | £189.66k | £208.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 NOV 2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 Cubbington Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 7AP
- Phone:
- 01926 257118
- Email:
- info@thriveym.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window