JUST WHIPPETS RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Just Whippets Rescue rescues, re homes and rehabilitates whippets in England and Wales through a network of foster homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2012: Standard registration
- SCRUPLES WHIPPET RESCUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE WEST | Chair | 08 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Mr T West | Trustee | 09 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIKE PANKHURST | Trustee | 18 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.08k | £22.09k | £22.93k | £44.41k | £24.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.71k | £41.37k | £42.24k | £35.47k | £35.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 29/10/2014
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF WHIPPETS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A NETWORK OF FOSTER HOMES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH WHIPPETS. 2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WHIPPETS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR WHIPPETS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE. 3) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO WHIPPET WELFARE, CANINE WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Castle Gate
Kenton
Exeter
EX6 8SQ
- Phone:
- 08456256211
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window