Financial history IVORIAN AND AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING WOMEN ACTION (IFRANS-WAG)

Charity number: 1149685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.25k £3.18k £5.71k £15.22k £10.22k
Total expenditure £4.29k £4.12k £3.50k £13.13k £10.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A