IVORIAN AND AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING WOMEN ACTION (IFRANS-WAG)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim is to develop Promoting social inclusion for Communities who are excluded from society due to language barrier, poor education or skills attainment; relationship; family breakdown and poor housing The advancement of education for the public benefit and the provision of afterschool clubs. The advancement of the Christian faith to bring unity, harmony, love in religion mainly,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
- City Of London
- Ivory Coast
Governance
- 09 November 2012: Standard registration
- IFANS-WAG (Working name)
- IVORIAN AND AFRICAN FRENCH SPEAKING WOMEN ACTION (IFRANS-WAG) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONE AGATHE SEUDIEU | Chair | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
DESIRE KOFFI | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
TOURE KHADY ARAM | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST EWONKEN | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARIE JEANNE NAGNOU | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
RACHELLE ZAGBAYOU | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £3.18k | £5.71k | £15.22k | £10.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.29k | £4.12k | £3.50k | £13.13k | £10.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 May 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/11/2012
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO BRING UNITY, HARMONY, LOVE IN RELIGION MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING THE WORDS OF GOD MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR PROVIDING TRAINING TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND THE PROVISION OF CLUBS. (3) THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING, COMMUNITY CARE AND SUPPORT AND CARE FOR GENERAL WELFARE GUIDANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 91
Taplow
Adelaide Road
LONDON
NW3 3NX
- Phone:
- 07508502115
- Email:
- ifranswag2010@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window