Trustees PEEPLE
Charity number: 1144975

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID BAILEY | Chair | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Laura Sylvia Kathleen Barbour | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth McQuade | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Krystyna Frances Grant | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kwasi Owusu-Asomaning | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
May Nancy Stimson | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Harris | Trustee | 12 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.