WESTERN WAY CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Services are held on Sundays at 11am and 6:00pm BST; 4pm GMT. Once a month there is a lunch and discussion session held on Thursdays from 12:30 - 2:15pm. Other special services and committee meetings are held throughout the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 December 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Henry Cox | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard George Blandford | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Cedric Cracknell | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PETER GREGORY NEWMAN HND | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN NOVELLO WATERS | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY MARK NEWMAN | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MIKE HENCHER | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.12k | £12.03k | £1.09m | £10.91k | £13.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.23k | £6.52k | £490.60k | £14.35k | £11.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £490.60k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 November 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2022 | 239 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF FAITH APPEARING IN SCHEDULE 1, INCLUDING RELIEVING THOSE IN NEED AND ENCOURAGING COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT. THESE OBJECTIVE MAY BE PURSUED ANYWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD DIRECTLY OR VIA OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 KNIGHTS WAY
NEWENT
GL18 1QJ
- Phone:
- 01531821471
- Email:
- MIKEHENCHER@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window