Trustees WESTERN WAY CHAPEL
Charity Number: 1144956

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Henry Cox | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Richard George Blandford | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Cedric Cracknell | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
PETER GREGORY NEWMAN HND | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN NOVELLO WATERS | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
GEOFFREY MARK NEWMAN | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MIKE HENCHER | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.