Accounts and annual returns IVY HOUSE FUNDS FOR FUN

Charity Number: 1146271
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 November 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 10 November 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 10 November 2015 23 November 2016 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 10 November 2014 27 January 2016 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 November 2014 Not Required