Financial history COLSTON'S PRIMARY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1146345
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £32.55k £10.58k £278 £75 £0
Total expenditure £32.65k £10.15k £9.00k £51.57k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0