Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ASHLEIGH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1146184
Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
Annual return 27 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
Annual return 27 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
Annual return 27 August 2020 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 27 August 2019 13 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 August 2019 Not Required