Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE CONVENT OF THE POOR CLARES, ELLESMERE

Charity Number: 1148712
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 February 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 10 March 2025 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 13 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window