EDEN PROJECT (OA) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The original lease between Eden Trust & RB Leasing Ltd (RBL) ceased on 31/12/11. At the end of this period, RBL granted an option lease to Eden Project (OA) Ltd (EPOA). No value is attributed to this in the accounts of EPOA- the assets are recorded in the accounts of a fellow subisdary of the Eden Trust. Other than holding the lease to the Eden site, the company continues to be non-tradng.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 14 December 2011: Standard registration
- 31 March 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 25 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/07/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN FLORA, FAUNA AND OTHER ASPECTS OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME (INCLUDING THE PUBLICATION OF THE LAWFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) AND FOR THAT PURPOSE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO MAKE SPACE AVAILABLE TO EDEN TRUST AT NIL OR NOMINAL RENT FOR AN ENVIRONMENTAL, EDUCATIONAL AND RESEARCH FACILITY IN WHICH THE WORLD'S PRINCIPAL ECOSYSTEMS ARE REPRODUCED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window