INTERSTAR FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Orthodox Jewish religion for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, study sessions, lectures and public celebration of religious festivals in accordance with the tenets of the Orthodox Jewish religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIKA ZALCBERG | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|||||
ARTUR KLEIN | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHANNA KLEIN | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.81k | £261.49k | £209.10k | £193.68k | £220.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £303.77k | £250.43k | £201.89k | £185.34k | £211.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, STUDY SESSIONS, LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARTIN & HELLER
5 NORTH END ROAD
LONDON
NW11 7RJ
- Phone:
- 02084556789
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window