ABOUT SPORTS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To be able to help young people achieve their full sporting potential in a friendly comfortable environment. Educate young people by involving them in sporting activities in other parts of the world. To use sports and activity to help young people to develop their skills and capabilities to create responsibility, confidence and individuality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 November 2012: Standard registration
- 09 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ASUK (Working name)
- ABOUT SPORTS LIMIKTED (Previous name)
- ABOUT SPORTS UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £5.39k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.57k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 28 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 23 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2013 | 28 August 2014 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, TO RELIEVE NEEDS OF AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.1 BY HELPING THEM DEVELOP THEIR SPORTING ABILITIES; 4.2 BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO KEEP PARTICIPATING IN PHYSICAL ACTIVITY THROUGH PROVISION OF FUN AND ENJOYABLE HEALTHY ACTIVITIES; 4.3 BY PROVIDING THE HIGHEST QUALITY (AND WORKING WITH) FULLY QUALIFIED COACHES, EXPERTS IN PLANNING WHO RUN A WIDE RANGE OF HEALTHY ACTIVITIES; 4.4 BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO CHOOSE HEALTHY AND POSITIVE LIFESTYLES THROUGH MENTORING AND CONSISTENT, EXPERT AND INDIVIDUAL ATTENTION; 4.5 BY HELPING THEM ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL IN A FRIENDLY COMFORTABLE ENVIRONMENT; 4.6 BY PROVIDING THEM WITH EASY ACCESS TO PROFESSIONAL MENTORING THROUGH SPORTS AND EDUCATIONAL COACHING ACTIVITIES; 4.7 BY PROVIDING HIGH QUALITY COACHING FOR ALL (AND NOT JUST FOR THE CHOSEN FEW WHO CAN AFFORD IT); 4.8 BY IMPROVING THEIR AWARENESS OF THEMSELVES AND THEIR SURROUNDINGS; 4.9 THROUGH EDUCATION BY INVOLVING THEM IN SPORTING ACTIVITIES IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD; 4.10 BY BUILDING BONDS WITH SCHOOLS, CLUBS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL AUTHORITIES TO HELP THEM TO BECOME HEALTHIER AND FIT THROUGH SPORT; 4.11 BY USING SPORTS AND HEALTHY ACTIVITIES TO HELP THEM DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES TO CREATE RESPONSIBILITY, CONFIDENCE AND INDIVIDUALITY; 4.12 BY EMPOWERING THEM TO GROW AND UNDERSTAND THEIR OWN CHARACTERISTICS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS AND INDEPENDENCE SO THEY MAY DEVELOP THEIR STANDING WITHIN THE COMMUNITY; AND 4.13 BY HELPING THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED THROUGH DIFFICULT CIRCUMSTANCES; FOR EXAMPLE, WHERE PARENTS ARE UNABLE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE THROUGH ILLNESS, THROUGH SPORT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window