Trustees WORCESTER STUDENTS' UNION
Charity Number: 1145192

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Otterwell | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
William David Calloway | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruttuja Rahul Mane | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Lambert | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Atkinson | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Charles Young | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erica Burke | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Williams | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.