The Origin Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trustees Do Not accept any unsolicited applications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2012: Standard registration
- THE FRANKHAM FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2019 | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.44k | £1.77k | £7.32k | £0 | £10.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.23k | £12.26k | £8.65k | £827.98k | £72.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/12/2011 as amended on 18 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") OF THE TRUST ARE TO FURTHER SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window