BEYOND CANCER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) The relief of sickness and the promotion of good health through the provision of support to people, predominantly from ethnic minority groups who have a cancer diagnosis, in particular those who have a breast cancer diagnosis living within the West Yorkshire area and supporting the work of other charities working with people with cancer diagnosis.Raising of public awareness of cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 24 May 2012: Standard registration
- LIVING BEYOND CANCER (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE CLAXTON-RUDDOCK | Chair | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Gloria Saunders | Trustee | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ISOLA BLAIR | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
VALARIE FRANCIS | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULA SWANSTON | Trustee | 19 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.40k | £590 | £1.57k | £1.44k | £17.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.40k | £1.41k | £2.36k | £2.97k | £19.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 November 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JAN 2011 AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT TO PEOPLE, PREDOMINANTLY FROM ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS WHO HAVE A CANCER DIAGNOSIS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO HAVE A BREAST CANCER DIAGNOSIS LIVING WITHIN THE LEEDS METROPOLITAN AREA AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF OTHER CHARITIES WORKING WITH PEOPLE WITH CANCER DIAGNOSIS. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY RAISING AWARENESS PARTICULARLY AMONGST HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS OF THE SUPPORT AND NEEDS OF PEOPLE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY GROUPS WHO HAVE A CANCER DIAGNOSIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEYOND CANCER CHARITY
PO BOX 463
LEEDS
LS17 1HQ
- Phone:
- 07549705457
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window