DIRECT MARKETING FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PUBLIC EDUCATION BY RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATING TO DIRECT MARKETING AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DIRECT MARKETING; IMPROVING LEGAL COMPLIANCE AND BEST PRACTICE IN THE FIELD OF DIRECT MARKETING; FURTHERING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2011: Standard registration
- 05 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2013 | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.08k | £1.98k | £341 | £341 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.73k | £102.47k | £234.13k | £234.13k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 23 July 2019 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 08 September 2017 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY RESEARCH INTO MATTERS RELATING TO DIRECT MARKETING AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF DIRECT MARKETING; 3. TO IMPROVE LEGAL COMPLIANCE AND BEST PRACTICE IN THE FIELD OF DIRECT MARKETING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND 4. TO PROMOTE ALL OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window