BURDETT BANGLADESHI CULTURAL ASSOCIATION (BBCA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a)?Relieving poverty, sickness and distress by through the provision of advice and information b)Advancing education in particular the provision of language and other subject classes c)Providing or assisting in the provision of facilities for the recreation and the leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare and the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 30 July 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kawsar Miah | Chair | 12 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Ali Newaz | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Muhhamad Ataur Rahman | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Haroon Rashid Miah | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Aliakber Abdur Rahman | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
MD Taj Uddin | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Abul Hasan Chowdhury | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Syed Mahbub Alam | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Saim Uddin | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Mohammad Abul Kashim | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Abdul Rafi | Trustee | 05 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Shafiqur Rahman | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Faruk Uddin Khan | Trustee | 12 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED AHBAB HUSSAIN | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.43k | £209.13k | £295.60k | £350.94k | £358.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.14k | £172.62k | £221.31k | £215.16k | £247.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.73k | £683 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 June 2024 | 374 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 June 2024 | 374 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 27 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/2012 as amended on 03 Jan 2020 as amended on 03 Jan 2020 as amended on 03 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP, PRAYER, CELEBRATION AND ISLAMIC OBSERVANCE; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC RELIGIOUS EDUCATION; 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BURDETT ESTATE IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. THE FIRST TWO OBJECTS ABOVE WILL BE UNDERTAKEN WITH PARTICULAR SENSITIVITY TO THE NEEDS OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY BUT ARE NOT RESTRICTED TO THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID LANE
OFF WALLWOOD STREET
LONDON
E14 7BW
- Phone:
- 02075362572
- Email:
- BBCA.Masjid@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window