HORN CONCERN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION/TRAINING, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES, THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, OVERSEAS AID/FAMINE RELIEF, ECONOMIC/COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT/EMPLOYMENT, CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE, MAKES GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS, MAKES GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS, PROVIDES SERVICES, HUMAN RIGHTS/RELIGIOUS OR RACIAL HARMONY/EQUALITY OR DIVERSITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
- Somalia
Governance
- 07 December 2011: Standard registration
- 18 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £72 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/12/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, WIDOWS, ORPHANS, REFUGEES, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER, CLOTHING, MEDICAL TREATMENT, REHABILITATION AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES; (3) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG POOR PEOPLE, ORPHANS, WIDOWS, THE BLIND, THE DISABLED AND PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR SERVICES FOR TREATMENT, FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND COUNSELING, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SPORTING ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (4) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS GOOD CITIZENS; (5) TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES, AND THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION, SUCH THAT SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS; (6) TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND FAITH GROUPS, IN WAYS THAT CREATES TRUST, UNITY AND PEACE BETWEEN THEM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window