Financial history PAKISTANI COMMUNITY CENTRE, OLDHAM

Charity number: 1148619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.45k £37.04k £61.37k £10.82k £161
Total expenditure £42.94k £19.45k £27.83k £52.77k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.58k £29.15k N/A N/A N/A