PAKISTANI COMMUNITY CENTRE, OLDHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PCC Oldham provides many activities and services including: Job Club Senior Citizens Health Club Training and learning classes Youth and Sports activities Advice and support with welfare, immigration, health and housing issues Hire of our facilities for social and cultural events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oldham
Governance
- 17 August 2012: Standard registration
- PCC (Working name)
- PAKISTANI COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rashid Hussain | Chair | 26 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
nasir mahmood | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
javed akhtar | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
faisal razaq | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.45k | £37.04k | £61.37k | £10.82k | £161 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.94k | £19.45k | £27.83k | £52.77k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.58k | £29.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 April 2025 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 February 2025 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2025 | 734 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2025 | 734 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 OCT 2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF INHABITANTS OF OLDHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOODS, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF THE PAKISTANI/KASHMIRI COMMUNITY, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
Selkirk Avenue
OLDHAM
OL8 4DQ
- Phone:
- 01616284800
- Email:
- manager@pccoldham.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window