Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAM HEALTH & EDUCATION SUPPORT

Charity number: 1145903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 06 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window