UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND STUDENTS' UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Support Activities, Fundraising, activitites of member organisations, management of entertainment venue, retail of food, beverages, stationery, sundry items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,410,964
Donations and legacies | £1.30m | |
Charitable activities | £97.40k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £17.57k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,360,941
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.36m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.36m | |
Retained for future use | £50.02k |
People

29 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
650 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
- Gateshead
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 19 July 2012: Standard registration
- USSU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Anne Clements | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Jamie Steven Young | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aliyu Babtunde Jimoh | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Richardson | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prince Chinedu Ikechi | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oludolapo Dada | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayleigh Tague | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Fogarty | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Christopher lawley-Powell | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rose Guy | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.09m | £1.45m | £1.68m | £1.38m | £1.41m | |
|
Total expenditure | £984.15k | £1.16m | £1.07m | £1.33m | £1.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £987.52k | £1.34m | £1.50m | £1.18m | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £98.01k | £104.51k | £172.19k | £182.97k | £97.40k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.12k | £267 | £1.06k | £14.41k | £17.57k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £984.15k | £1.03m | £1.07m | £1.33m | £1.36m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.68k | £5.18k | £5.60k | £5.60k | £5.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £127.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.04k | £10.06k | £11.14k | £23.48k | £15.39k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £416.41k | £836.14k | £1.20m | £1.05m | £506.85k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.72m | -£2.72m | -£2.29m | -£2.08m | -£1.84m | |
|
Total liabilities | £213.09k | £347.12k | £135.53k | £305.62k | £104.17k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/07/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 MAR 2019 as amended on 09 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE UNION ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1. PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; 2. BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND THE UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND 3. PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ground Floor
Edinburgh Building
University of Sunderland
Chester Road
SUNDERLAND
Tyne & W
- Phone:
- 01915153030
- Email:
- ussu@sunderland.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window