MOTHER TONGUE & SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of MTSSP members in supporting educational achievement of children and young people and relieving poverty within their communities, through providing advice, advocacy training and any other charitable activities in line with the charitable aims of the organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 May 2012: Standard registration
- MTSSP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohamed Hussein | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Senait Gebrehiwet | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Yussuf Ahmed | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Sandra Volcere | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Ghile | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahcene Mohamed Nacer | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sadia Ahmed-Nur Ali | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.67k | £7.67k | £6.33k | £7.97k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £4.43k | £4.98k | £3.75k | £8.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 February 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 NOV 2004
Charitable objects
2. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO: TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF MTSSP MEMBERS IN SUPPORTING EDUCATIONAL ACHIEVEMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND RELIEVING POVERTY WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITIES, THROUGH PROVIDING ADVICE, ADVOCACY TRAINING AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES IN LINE WITH THE CHARITABLE AIMS OF THE ORGANISATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
50-51 Corker Walk
LONDON
N7 7RY
- Phone:
- 02075619830
- Email:
- admin@mtssp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window