AUDLEM DISTRICT AMENITIES SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE LOCAL AMENITIES SUCH AS PLANTS,TREES AND GENERAL COMMUNITY ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 17 May 1973: Standard registration
- THE AUDLEM DISTRICT AMENITIES SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Frank Goodyear | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRYONY NIXON | Trustee | 23 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BILL CONSTERDINE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.72k | £4.23k | £9.13k | £14.41k | £13.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.12k | £3.65k | £9.48k | £13.10k | £18.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 1973.
Charitable objects
(A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORICAL AND PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF AUDLEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Cheshire Street
Audlem
CREWE
CW3 0AH
- Phone:
- 01270811705
- Email:
- adascontact@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window