Financial history THE CYRIL FLINT VOLUNTEER CHARITY

Charity number: 1146179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £116.19k £103.16k £70.25k £84.97k £79.12k
Total expenditure £94.03k £68.17k £78.46k £130.15k £106.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A