TARA YOGA CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre's objectives are to advance public education in the classical teachings of Yoga based on the highest standards of personal conduct and service to others, and to promote and advance the study and practice of and research into the therapeutic effects of Yoga as a means of preserving, protecting and improving the mental, physical and spiritual health of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 10 January 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mojdeh Moasser | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ofer Yariv | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Frangi | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £419.50k | £293.55k | £341.10k | £341.64k | £334.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £417.51k | £284.29k | £293.87k | £394.23k | £343.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £86.74k | £13.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
19 July 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 AUG 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED ARE: 3.1 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE CLASSICAL TEACHINGS OF YOGA BASED ON THE HIGHEST STANDARDS OF PERSONAL CONDUCT AND SERVICE TO OTHERS 3.2 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE THERAPEUTIC EFFECTS OF YOGA AS A MEANS OF PRESERVING PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE MENTAL PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH OF THE COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXPORT HOUSE
25-31 IRONMONGER ROW
LONDON
EC1V 3QW
- Phone:
- 02072518628
- Email:
- info@tarayogacentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window