NORTHERN GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer sanctuary for stray and unwanted hounds and also sick and injured hounds. We aim to rehabilitate and re-home as many stray, abandoned and unwanted hounds as we can. We are based in the Lancashire/North west area but operate on a national basis so we have a wider area for finding the right foster homes and permanent homes for the hounds in our care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 February 2012: Standard registration
- N.G.R. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE HOLLAND | Chair | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Janet Evans | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Crossley | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALISON RYDING | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA GETHING | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANN GETHING | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.90k | £55.06k | £62.68k | £68.23k | £80.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.94k | £49.22k | £69.08k | £75.57k | £80.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/07/2011
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. (2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Appleton Close
Poulton-le-Fylde
FY6 7RF
- Phone:
- 01253891589
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window