Financial history THE LO FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1145845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.00k
Total expenditure £800 £900 £415 £2.46k £560
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A