LITTLEHAMPTON CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting estranged parents to have regular contact with their children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 12 January 2012: Standard registration
- MEETING POINT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Pauley | Trustee | 12 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dahill | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev MARK JONATHAN STANDEN | Trustee | 12 December 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74k | £1.25k | £2.71k | £3.79k | £4.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £2.73k | £2.18k | £3.09k | £3.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/04/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO OFFER A SAFE, FRIENDLY AND NEUTRAL ENVIRONMENT IN WEST SUSSEX WHERE CHILDREN OF SEPARATED FAMILIES CAN SPEND TIME WITH ONE OR BOTH PARENTS AND SOMETIMES OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malt Barn Cottage
Weavers Hill
ANGMERING
West Sussex
BN16 4BE
- Phone:
- 07771 520171
- Website:
-
littlehamptonchildcontactcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window