Financial history Friends of the National Civil War Centre-Newark Museum

Charity number: 1146475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.96k £120 £689 £1.19k £2.99k
Total expenditure £6.09k £726 £4.64k £1.75k £4.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A