THE HURSTCOTE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1145372
Charity reporting is up to date (112 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principle activities of Forging Futures, the working name of the charity, is to help children, young people and adults feel supported, safe and have access to education, training and employment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £42,902
Total expenditure: £17,153

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • Forging Futures (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Gosman Trustee 02 August 2023
FORGING FUTURES
Recently registered
Mazin Majed Trustee 02 August 2023
None on record
THOMAS EDWARD HUFTON Trustee 10 January 2012
FORGING FUTURES
Recently registered
OSHA ANNE HUFTON Trustee 10 January 2012
FORGING FUTURES
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.69k £4.57k £184 £2.00k £42.90k
Total expenditure £18.36k £46.15k £1.90k £2.16k £17.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 May 2025 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 28 May 2025 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 March 2024 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Forging Futures
The Green
Shamley Green
Surrey
GU5 0UB
Phone:
00