ALEC'S ANGELS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has supported children diagnosed with cancer and their families providing both financial and practical support during the child's stay away from home through collaboration with Helen & Douglas House Hospice, CLIC Sargeant at the John Radcliffe Hospital and the Lennox Childrens Cancer Fund. The charity also supports children when at home with trips out and gifts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 February 2012: Standard registration
- 09 August 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 November 2015: Re-registered
- 04 September 2019: Funds received from 1035234 CHILDS PLAY TOY LIBRARY
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN JARVIS | Chair | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Keatley | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Lorimer | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DUKE BURTON | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.35k | £9.60k | £11.46k | £21.64k | £24.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £7.75k | £10.74k | £14.52k | £20.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 DEC 2011 DATED 15/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN DIAGNOSED WITH CANCER, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Hare Close
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 7EN
- Phone:
- 07761661777
- Email:
- BRIAN@ALECSANGELS.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window