RYHOPE ENGINES TRUST

Charity number: 502448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preservation and display of Victorian Pumping Station

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,000
Total expenditure: £9,485

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEITH BELL Chair 28 November 2017
None on record
Julie Wilson Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Vincent James Cassidy Trustee 01 April 2016
NEWCASTLE AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Raymond Carlson Trustee 09 January 2015
None on record
STAFFORD LINSLEY Trustee
None on record
LESLIE JORDAN Trustee
None on record
JOHN ROBERT FRASER Trustee
None on record
John Dennis Mowbray Trustee
SUNDERLAND MUSIC, ARTS & CULTURE TRUST
Received: On time
Sunderland Empire Theatre Trust
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.70k £3.24k £11.00k £8.63k £10.00k
Total expenditure £10.73k £5.09k £10.50k £7.44k £9.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 February 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 March 2022 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ryhope Engines Trust
The Pumping Station
The Waterworks
SUNDERLAND
SR2 0ND
Phone:
07719909256