ROTHER VALLEY TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a day care charity supporting older people experiencing the effects of social isolation and loneliness. We offer lively and fun activities,and provide a cooked lunch. Transport is available. We promote members' health, wellbeing, and independence. Working with other community organisations we promote members' improved access to a wider range of other local community activities and services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 May 2012: Standard registration
- RVT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney John Maguire | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Watts | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET RHONA GUEST | Trustee | 08 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS BOXLEY | Trustee | 08 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.52k | £54.73k | £69.61k | £43.54k | £60.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.16k | £51.91k | £68.51k | £77.88k | £85.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £50.00k | N/A | £12.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £53.00k | £3.00k | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE,INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.SOCIAL INCLUSION AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITH THE AIM OF PROMOTING COMMUNITY COHESION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. 2.PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY,OR PARTS OF SOCIETY,AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS:UNEMPLOYMENT;FINANCIAL HARDSHIP;YOUTH OR OLD AGE;ILL HEALTH(PHYSICAL OR MENTAL)SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS;DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX,RACE,DISABILITY,ETHNIC ORIGIN,RELIGION,BELIEF,CREED,SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT;POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT;RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN;POOR HOUSING(THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS;CRIME(EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY)” 3.THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FOR EXAMPLE: (A)THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE,GENDER,DISABILITY,SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C)PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D)CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E)CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITH THE AIM OF PROMOTING COMMUNITY COHESION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. "BY COMMUNITY COHESION WE MEAN WORKING TOWARDS A SOCIETY IN WHICH: 1.THERE IS A COMMON VISION AND SENSE OF BELONGING BY ALL COMMUNITIES 2.THE DIVERSITY OF PEOPLE'S BACKGROUNDS AND CIRCUMSTANCES IS APPRECIATED AND VALUED 3.SIMILAR LIFE OPPORTUNITIES ARE AVAILABLE TO ALL,AND 4.STRONG AND POSITIVE RELATIONSHIPS EXIST AND CONTINUE TO BE DEVELOPED IN THE WORKPLACE,IN SCHOOLS AND IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY."
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Grange
Bepton Road
Midhurst
West Sussex
GU29 9HD
- Phone:
- 07957 405 959
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window