BROOKS CITY FARM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 26 January 2012: Standard registration
- 15 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2012 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 DEC 2011
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1.1.1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND ELSEWHERE IN LONDON, (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, AGE, RACE, DISABILITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS OR BELIEFS, BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND/OR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, AND PARTICULARLY OF THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY, OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 1.1.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND PARTICULARLY YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS, AND IN PRINCIPLES OF SELF DISCIPLINE AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 1.1.3 TO PROMOTE AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT HUMANITY AND MORALITY BY EDUCATING THEM IN CARE AND CONSIDERATION OF ALL ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION, AND FOR THESE PURPOSES TO CARE FOR AND EXHIBIT ANIMALS IN COMMON AGRICULTURAL AND DOMESTIC USE SO THAT THE PUBLIC AND PARTICULARLY THE YOUNGER MEMBERS THEREOF, WILL LEARN A GREATER AWARENESS OF AND APPRECIATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS. 1.1.4 TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, RESIDENT IN THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT, SO AS TO PREPARE THEM FOR ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, AND THEREBY ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE OR ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVELIHOOD. 1.1.5 TO RELIEVE THOSE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, PHYSICAL IMPAIRMENTS OR DISABLED OR DEPRIVED INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES SUCH AS REMEDIAL RECREATIONAL OR THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window