Financial history BUTALE PROJECT

Charity number: 1145614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £43.45k £35.70k £15.83k £44.59k £55.17k
Total expenditure £45.04k £22.90k £34.17k £39.29k £43.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A