Trustees BUTALE PROJECT
Charity number: 1145614

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS M SAWYER | Chair | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Shelley Pritchard | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren O'Connor | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Caitlin Sawyer | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Pointer | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dargan | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise James | Trustee | 13 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR D J SAWYER | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.