FRIENDS OF THORNGROVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Thorngrove Charity is focused on the following : - Raise money for the items that can be donated to Thorngrove School for the educational enhancement of the pupils - Raise monies for nominated national and local charities - Act as a focal point for social events that will foster a community spirit with parents, teachers and pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 19 April 2012: Standard registration
- FOT (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henrietta Bridgman | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Higgs | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edel Mary Thomas | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.04k | £9.06k | £9.73k | £54.86k | £23.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £457 | £7.24k | £47.19k | £14.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 May 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED ON 26/03/2012
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THORNGROVE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION ENHANCEMENT OF THE PUPILS; AND 2) TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES DEED FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thorngrove School
The Mount
Highclere
Highclere
Newbury
RG18 0RU
- Phone:
- 01635 253172
- Email:
- FOT@THORNGROVESCHOOL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window