Trustees SPRINGFIELD BEES PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Debbie Pepper Chair 10 July 2019
None on record
Daniel Clark Trustee 04 February 2025
None on record
Lauren Land Trustee 26 January 2025
None on record
Laura Martin Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Sophie O'Sullivan Trustee 09 December 2021
None on record