Accounts and annual returns ETERNAL SACRED ORDER OF CHERUBIM & SERAPHIM SOURCE OF JOY (ERI ORISUN AYO)

Charity number: 1147684
Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days
Accounts and TAR 16 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 208 days
Annual return 16 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days
Accounts and TAR 16 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days
Annual return 16 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
Accounts and TAR 16 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
Annual return 16 December 2020 15 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 16 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 December 2019 Not Required