Financial history RAZA ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 1147125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £22.21k £22.89k £62.83k £60.88k £65.28k
Total expenditure £14.60k £25.61k £20.13k £28.52k £31.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £400 N/A N/A N/A